Docket for 24-6364
|
Jan 17 2025 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 21, 2025) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixOtherProof of Service | Jan 28 2025 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 30 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. | | | Feb 05 2025 | Response Requested. (Due March 7, 2025) | | | Mar 07 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2025 to April 7, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 10 2025 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 7, 2025. | | | Apr 07 2025 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 18 2025 | Reply of petitioner Cedric Cromwell filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 24 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025. | | |
|