Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-6126
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-6126
Title:Joel S. Elliott, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 11, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-8019)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 10, 2025)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 30 2024Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 02 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2025.
Jan 08 2025Response Requested. (Due February 7, 2025)
Jan 29 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2025 to March 10, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 30 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 10, 2025.
Mar 03 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 10, 2025 to April 9, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 9, 2025.
Apr 09 2025Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 23 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025.
May 08 2025Reply of petitioner Joel Elliott filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 19 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Carl Arceci
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
633 17th St
Suite 1000
Denver, CO 80202

JOHN_ARCECI@FD.ORG
303-294-7002
Party name: Joel Elliott
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543