Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-584
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-584
Title:Annette Chambers-Smith, Director, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Petitioner
v.
Kayla Jean Ayers
Docketed:November 27, 2024
Linked with 2
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-3735)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 25 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2024Application (24A553) to recall and stay the mandate, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 05 2024Response to application (24A553) requested by Justice Kavanaugh, due by 4 p.m. (EST) on December 12, 2024.
Dec 12 2024Response to application from respondent Kayla Ayers filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 13 2024Reply of applicant Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Director filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 17 2024Application (24A553) referred to the Court.
Dec 17 2024Application (24A553) to recall and stay the mandate presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is denied.
Dec 26 2024Waiver of right of respondent Kayla Ayers to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 31 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2025.
Jan 07 2025Response Requested. (Due February 6, 2025)
Jan 23 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 6, 2025 to March 7, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2025.
Feb 24 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2025 to April 7, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 7, 2025.
Apr 07 2025Brief of respondent Kayla Ayers in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 21 2025Reply of petitioner Annette Chambers-Smith, Director, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2025Notice of Supplemental Authority of Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Director submitted.
Main Document
Apr 23 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2025.
May 19 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Elliot Gaiser
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Ohio Attorney General
30 E. Broad St., 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

thomas.gaiser@ohioago.gov
6144668980
Party name: Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Director
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

phughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8000
Party name: Kayla Ayers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543