Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-5438
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-5438
Title:Michael Bowe, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 3, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-11704)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 29 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 3, 2024)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Sep 11 2024Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 19 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2024.
Sep 26 2024Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2024)
Oct 29 2024Out of time motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2024 to November 27, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 30 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 27, 2024. See Rule 15.1.
Nov 26 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2024Reply of petitioner Michael Bowe filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025.
Jan 13 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2025.
Jan 17 2025Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Feb 20 2025Kasdin M. Mitchell, Esquire, of Dallas, Texas, is invited to brief and argue, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below as to Question 1 presented by the petition for a writ of certiorari.
Feb 28 2025Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Mar 03 2025Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including April 7, 2025. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 11, 2025. The brief of the Court-appointed amicus curiae shall be filed on or before August 22, 2025.
Mar 03 2025Briefs of amicus curiae in support of the petitioner on either question presented are to be filed on or before April 14, 2025. Any other briefs of amicus curiae are to be filed on or before August 29, 2025.
Apr 07 2025Brief of petitioner Michael Bowe filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2025Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Apr 14 2025Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2025Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2025Brief amici curiae of University of Virginia School of Law’s Civil Rights Clinic, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2025Brief amici curiae of Habeas Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2025Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

ANDREW_ADLER@FD.ORG
9543567436
Party name: Michael Bowe
Attorneys for Respondent
Kasdin M. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
4550 Travis Street
Dallas, TX 75225

kasdin.mitchell@kirkland.com
202-389-5165
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Kwaku Affawua Akowuah
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kakowuah@sidley.com
202 736 8000
Party name: Habeas Scholars
Jeffrey Weihao Chen
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant Mixson & Elmore, LLP
1201 West Peachtree St NW, Suite 3900
Atlanta, GA 30309

chen@bmelaw.com
404-881-4104
Party name: FEDERAL COURTS SCHOLARS
Jennifer Niles Coffin
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee
800 S. Gay Street
Suite 2400
Knoxville, TN 37929

JENNIFER_COFFIN@FD.ORG
(865) 637-7979
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Gary Michael Fox
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20037

gary.fox@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Juan Otoniel Perla
    Counsel of Record
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP
1717 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20006

JPERLA@CURTIS.COM
(212) 452-7373
Party name: University of Virginia School of Law’s Civil Rights Clinic and Four Other Civil Rights Organizations

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543