Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-503
RSS Feed Print Notify MeSearch documents in this case:
No. 24-503
Title:Upstate Jobs Party, et al., Petitioners
v.
Peter S. Kosinski, New York State Board of Elections Co-Chair Commissioner, et al.
Docketed:November 4, 2024
Linked with 24A266
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2518, 21-2557)
   Decision Date:July 3, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2024Application (24A266) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 1, 2024 to October 31, 2024, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Sep 17 2024Application (24A266) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 31, 2024.
Oct 31 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2024Waiver of right of respondent Peter Kosinski, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 13 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2024.
Nov 20 2024Response Requested. (Due December 20, 2024)
Nov 27 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2024 to January 21, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 21, 2025.
Jan 21 2025Brief of respondents Peter Kosinski, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2025Reply of petitioners Upstate Jobs Party, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 05 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025.
Feb 24 2025Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shawn Toomey Sheehy
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky and Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street NW, Ste 643A
Washington, DC 20037

ssheehy@holtzmanvogel.com
2027378808
Party name: Upstate Jobs Party, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: Peter Kosinski, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543