Docket for 24-474
|
Oct 29 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2024) | | PetitionProof of Service | Nov 21 2024 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Food and Drug Administration filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 29 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent SWT Global Supply, Inc., et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025. | | | Dec 05 2024 | Response Requested. (Due January 6, 2025) | | | Jan 06 2025 | Brief of respondents SWT Global Supply, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 22 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. | | | Jan 22 2025 | Reply of petitioner Food and Drug Administration filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 14 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. | | | Apr 21 2025 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of FDA v. Wages and White Lion Investments, LLC, 604 U. S. ___ (2025). | | |
|