SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-284
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-284
Title:
Andre Ricardo Briscoe, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
September 12, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-4013)
Decision Date:
April 30, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
June 6, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2024)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 17 2024
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 20 2024
Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 25 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2024.
Oct 15 2024
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Oscar Markus
Counsel of Record
Markus/Moss
40 NW 3RD STREET
PH1
MIAMI, FL 33128
dmarkus@markuslaw.com
3053796667
Party name: Andrew Ricardo Briscoe
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Amy Mason Saharia
Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024
ASAHARIA@WC.COM
202-434-5847
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##