Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-129
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-129
Title:Deadria Farmer-Paellmann, et al., Petitioners
v.
Smithsonian Institution
Docketed:August 6, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5196)
   Decision Date:December 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:February 29, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 28 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2024Waiver of right of respondent Smithsonian Institution to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 11 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024.
Oct 07 2024Petition DENIED. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Bruce Ira Afran
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
10 Braeburn Drive
Princeton, NJ 08540

bruceafran@aol.com
(609) 454-7435
Party name: Deadria Farmer-Paellmann, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Smithsonian Institution

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543