Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-1132
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-1132
Title:Purdue Pharma L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Docketed:May 2, 2025
Linked with 24A879
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2023-1953)
   Decision Date:December 30, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 10 2025Application (24A879) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 30, 2025 to April 30, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 13 2025Application (24A879) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until April 30, 2025.
Apr 30 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 2, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM
202-637-2207
Party name: Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543