Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-1098
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-1098
Title:Monsanto Company, Petitioner
v.
Larry Johnson, et al.
Docketed:April 22, 2025
Linked with 24A866
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Oregon
   Case Numbers:(A179665)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 19, 2024

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 07 2025Application (24A866) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 19, 2025 to April 18, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Mar 11 2025Application (24A866) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 18, 2025.
Apr 18 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Monsanto Company

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543