Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-1097
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-1097
Title:Monsanto Company, a Foreign Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Nancy C. Salas
Docketed:April 22, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-14030)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2025
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 18 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 22, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 22, 2025 to June 20, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 05 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 20, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Monsanto Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen F. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Podhurst Orseck, P.A.
2525 Ponce de Leon Boulevard
Suite 500
Coral Gables, FL 33134

SROSENTHAL@PODHURST.COM
305-358-2800
Party name: Nancy C. Salas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543