SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-1073
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-1073
Title:
Ghislaine Maxwell, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
April 14, 2025
Linked with 2
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-1426)
Decision Date:
September 17, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
November 25, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2025
Application (24A709) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 23, 2025 to April 10, 2025, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jan 21 2025
Application (24A709) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 10, 2025.
Apr 10 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 14, 2025)
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Petition
May 07 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 14, 2025 to June 13, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 08 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 13, 2025.
May 09 2025
Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Oscar Markus
Counsel of Record
Markus/Moss
40 N.W. Third Street
Penthouse One
Miami, FL 33128
dmarkus@markuslaw.com
(305) 379-6667
Party name: Ghislaine Maxwell
Attorneys for Respondent
D. John Sauer
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Sara Elizabeth Kropf
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Sara Kropf PLLC
1100 H Street NW
Suite 1220
Washington, DC 20005
sara@kmlawfirm.com
2026276900
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##