SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-1068
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-1068
Title:
Monsanto Company, Petitioner
v.
John L. Durnell
Docketed:
April 9, 2025
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Missouri, Eastern District
Case Numbers:
(ED112410)
Decision Date:
February 11, 2025
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
April 1, 2025
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2025)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 29 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2025 to June 9, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 30 2025
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 9, 2025.
May 01 2025
Amicus brief of Atlantic Legal Foundation submitted.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314
PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Monsanto Company
Attorneys for Respondent
David C. Frederick
Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209
DFREDERICK@KELLOGGHANSEN.COM
202-326-7900
Party name: John L. Durnell
Other
Lawrence S. Ebner
Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006
lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##