SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-1058
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-1058
Title:
CloudofChange, LLC, Petitioner
v.
NCR Corporation
Docketed:
April 8, 2025
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2023-1111)
Decision Date:
December 18, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
February 19, 2025
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2025)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 08 2025
Waiver of right of respondent NCR Corp. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 16 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jerry Robin Selinger
Counsel of Record
Patterson + Sheridan, LLP
1700 Pacific Avenue
Suite 2650
Dallas, TX 75201
jselinger@pattersonsheridan.com
(214) 272-0957
Party name: CloudofChange, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Whitfield Hughes
Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001
phughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8988
Party name: NCR Corp.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##