Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-1026
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-1026
Title:Oregon, Petitioner
v.
Committee to Recall Dan Holladay, et al.
Docketed:March 25, 2025
Linked with 24A699
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-35107)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:October 23, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2024Application (24A699) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 22, 2025.
Dec 23 2024Application (24A699) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 21, 2025 to March 22, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 21 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2025)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 16 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 24, 2025 to May 27, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2025.
Apr 18 2025Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.oregon.gov
503-378-4402
Party name: Oregon
Attorneys for Respondents
Jesse Allen Buss
    Counsel of Record
Willamette Law Group, PC
411 Fifth St.
Oregon City, OR 97045-2224

jesse@WLGpnw.com
503-656-4884
Party name: Committee to Recall Dan Holladay; Jeana Gonzales; Adam Marl
Other
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic,Columbus School of Law
3600 John McCormack Rd. NE
Washington, DC 20064

mccotter@cua.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543