Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-1025
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-1025
Title:Daniel Z. Crowe, et al., Petitioners
v.
State Bar of Oregon, et al.
Docketed:March 25, 2025
Linked with 24A702
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-35193)
   Decision Date:August 28, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:October 22, 2024
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 13 2025Application (24A702) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 20, 2025 to March 21, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 17 2025Application (24A702) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 21, 2025.
Mar 21 2025Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2025)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 24, 2025 to May 30, 2025, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 21 2025Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 27, 2025.
Apr 21 2025Brief amicus curiae of Mackinac Center for Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2025Brief amicus curiae of Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 24 2025Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 24 2025Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 24 2025Brief amicus curiae of First Liberty Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2025Brief amici curiae of The Buckeye Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott Day Freeman
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

sfreeman@goldwaterinstitute.org
602-462-5000
Party name: Daniel Z. Crowe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kristin Mariko Asai
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
601 SW Second Ave., Suite 1800
Portland, OR 97204

kristin.asai@hklaw.com
5035172948
Party name: State Bar of OR, et al.
Other
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc.
Jeffrey Michael Schwab
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
7500 Rialto Blvd.
Suite 1-250
Austin, TX 78735

JSchwab@LJC.org
512-481-4400
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: First Liberty Institute
Timothy Ray Snowball
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
P.O. Box 552
Olympia, WA 98507

tsnowball@freedomfoundation.com
(360) 956-3482
Party name: Freedom Foundation
David Christian Tryon
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street, Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
(614) 224-4422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute and The Pelican Institute
Derk Arend Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Mackinac Center Legal Foundation
140 W. Main Street
Midland, MI 48640

wilcox@mackinac.org
9896310900
Party name: Mackinac Center for Public Policy

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543