SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-1024
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-1024
Title:
Clarence Cocroft, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chris Graham, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Revenue, et al.
Docketed:
March 25, 2025
Linked with 24A716
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(24-60086)
Decision Date:
November 22, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2025
Application (24A716) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 20, 2025 to March 24, 2025, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jan 23 2025
Application (24A716) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 22, 2025.
Mar 21 2025
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2025)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 09 2025
Waiver of right of respondent Chris Graham, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 16 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025.
Apr 24 2025
Brief amicus curiae of Weed for Warriors Project filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 24 2025
Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.(Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ari Simon Bargil
Counsel of Record
lnstitute for Justice
2 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3180
Miami, FL 33131
abargil@ij.org
305-721-1600
Party name: Clarence Cocroft, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Justin L. Matheny
Counsel of Record
Office of the Mississippi Attorney General
550 High Street
11th Floor
Jackson, MS 39201
justin.matheny@ago.ms.gov
601-359-3680
Party name: Chris Graham, et al.
Other
Thomas Arthur Berry
Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001
tberry@cato.org
(443) 254-6330
Party name: Cato Institute
Timothy S. Durst
Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2801 North Harwood Street
Suite 1600
Dallas, TX 75201
tdurst@omm.com
972-360-1923
Party name: Weed for Warriors Project
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##