Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 24-1019
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 24-1019
Title:Kurt Kanam, Petitioner
v.
Doug Burgum, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:March 24, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-5121)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2024
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 26 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 23, 2025)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2025Supplemental brief of petitioner Kurt Kanam filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 06 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/22/2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kurt Kanam
    Counsel of Record
2103 Harrison Avenue NW
Suite 2-143
Olympia, WA 98502

Party name: Kurt Kanam
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, D 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543