Docket for 23-886
|
Jan 05 2023 | Application (23A632) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 24, 2024 to February 14, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 09 2024 | Application (23A632) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until February 14, 2024. | | | Feb 14 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 14 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Massachusetts to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 18 2024 | Brief amici curiae of National Association for Public Defense and Massachusetts Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. | | | Mar 26 2024 | Response Requested. (Due April 25, 2024) | | | Apr 04 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2024 to May 28, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 05 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 28, 2024. | | |
|