Docket for 23-876
|
Nov 29 2023 | Application (23A497) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 1, 2024 to February 12, 2024, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main Document | Dec 05 2023 | Application (23A497) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 12, 2024. | | | Feb 12 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2024 to April 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 27 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2024. | | | Mar 13 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Advance Colorado Institute and Colorado Strong Business Alliance filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 15 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Inc., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 15 2024 | Brief for Julie A. Su, Acting Secretary of Labor, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 24 2024 | Reply of petitioner KC Transport, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 30 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024. | | | Jun 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024. | | | Jul 02 2024 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Loper Bright Enterprises v. Raimondo, 603 U. S. ___ (2024). | | | Aug 05 2024 | Judgment Issued. | | Main Document |
|