SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-825
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-825
Title:
Salvatore Delligatti, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
January 31, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-2482, 18-2610)
Decision Date:
October 2, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
December 14, 2023
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 29 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 1, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 21 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2024.
Feb 29 2024
Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Public Defense filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2024
Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 07 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2024 to May 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2024.
May 01 2024
Brief for the United States filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 03 2024
Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
May 07 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024.
May 07 2024
Reply of petitioner Salvatore Delligatti filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allon Kedem
Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001
ALLON.KEDEM@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
2029425000
Party name: Salvatore Delligatti
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007
alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Daniel Hirotsu Woofter
Counsel of Record
Goldstein, Russell & Woofter LLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006
DW@GOLDSTEINRUSSELL.COM
202-240-8433
Party name: National Association for Public Defense
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##