May 10 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 17, 2024) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix |
Jun 14 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent W.L. York, Inc., et al. to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Jun 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/30/2024. |
| |
Sep 25 2024 | Response Requested. (Due October 25, 2024) |
| |
Sep 30 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2024 to November 25, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 25, 2024. |
| |
Nov 07 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2024 to January 24, 2025, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Nov 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 24, 2025 (60-day extension). |
| |
Nov 23 2024 | Letter from counsel for respondents received. |
| Main Document |
Jan 15 2025 | Brief of respondents W.L. York, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jan 15 2025 | Corporate disclosure statement with respect to brief of respondents filed. |
| Main Document |
Jan 30 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/21/2025. |
| |
Feb 18 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Feb 24 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/28/2025. |
| |
Feb 25 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Mar 03 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/7/2025. |
| |
Mar 03 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Mar 17 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/21/2025. |
| |
Mar 19 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Mar 24 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2025. |
| |
Mar 26 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Mar 31 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/4/2025. |
| |
Apr 01 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Apr 11 2025 | Reply of petitioner Chanel E.M. Nicholson filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Apr 14 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2025. |
| |
Apr 15 2025 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Apr 21 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/25/2025. |
| |
Apr 28 2025 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025. |
| |