Docket for 23-6621
|
Jan 26 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 29, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 21 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 29, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 22 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2024. | | | Apr 01 2024 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 18 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. | | | May 13 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|