Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22A184
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22A184
Title:Yeshiva University, et al., Applicants
v.
YU Pride Alliance, et al.
Docketed:August 29, 2022
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(2022-02726)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 29 2022Application (22A184) for a stay, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 29 2022Response to application (22A184) requested by Justice Sotomayor, due 5 p.m. (EDT), September 2, 2022.
Aug 29 2022Blanket Consent of Yeshiva University and President Ari Berman not accepted for filing. (August 30, 2022)
Aug 30 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Douglas Laycock.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty and Coalition for Jewish Values.
Main Document
Sep 01 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Orthodox Jewish Organizations.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Response to application from respondents YU Pride Alliance, Molly Meisels, Doniel Weinreich, Amitai Miller, and Anonymous filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Sep 02 2022Proof of Service of Agudath Israel of America not accepted for filing. (September 07, 2022)
Sep 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chief Rabbi of South Africa, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Agudath Israel of America.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Council for Christian Colleges & Universities.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Sep 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Archdiocese of New York, et al.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New Civil Liberties Alliance.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Professor Richard A. Epstein.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 02 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Association of Classical Christian Schools, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 03 2022Reply of applicant Yeshiva University, et al. filed
ReplyProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae of Chief Rabbi of South Africa, Rabbi Dr. Warren Goldstein, the Chief Rabbi of Ukraine, Rabbi Moshe Reuven Azman; Rabbi and Rabbinical Judge of the Upper Beth Din of Israel, Rabbi Eliezer Igra, Chief Rabbi Pinchas Goldschmidt, President of the Conference of European Rabbis, and Rabbinical Council of America not accepted for filing. (September 08, 2022--Corrected version to be submitted)
Sep 07 2022Letter Advising of the Addition of Amicus to Previously Filed Brief of Council for Christian Colleges & Universities not accepted for filing. (September 14, 2022)
Sep 08 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Chief Rabbi Ephraim Mirvis.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 09 2022Upon consideration of the application of counsel for the applicants and the response and reply field thereto, it is ordered that the injunction of the New York trial court, case No. 154010/2021, is hereby stayed pending further order of Justice Sotomayor or of the Court.
Sep 14 2022Application (22A184) referred to the Court.
Sep 14 2022The application (22A184) for stay pending appeal of a permanent injunction entered by the New York trial court, presented to Justice Sotomayor and by her referred to the Court, is denied without prejudice to applicants again seeking relief from this Court if, upon properly seeking expedited review and interim relief from the New York courts, applicants receive neither. The order heretofore entered by Justice Sotomayor is vacated. Applicants Yeshiva University and its president seek emergency relief from a non-final order of the New York trial court requiring the University to treat an LGBTQ student group similarly to other student groups in its student club recognition process. The application is denied because it appears that applicants have at least two further avenues for expedited or interim state court relief. First, applicants may ask the New York courts to expedite consideration of the merits of their appeal. Applicants do not assert, nor does the Appellate Division docket reveal, that they have ever requested such relief. Second, applicants may file with the Appellate Division a corrected motion for permission to appeal that court’s denial of a stay to the New York Court of Appeals, as the Appellate Division clerk’s office directed applicants to do on August 25. Applicants may also ask the Appellate Division to expedite consideration of that motion. If applicants seek and receive neither expedited review nor interim relief from the New York courts, they may return to this Court. Justice Alito, with whom Justice Thomas, Justice Gorsuch, and Justice Barrett join, dissent. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
202-955-0095
Party name: Yeshiva University and President Ari Berman
Attorneys for Respondent
Debra L. Greenberger
    Counsel of Record
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
600 Fifth Avenue, 10th Floor
New York, NY 10020

dgreenberger@ecbalaw.com
(212) 763-5000
Party name: YU Pride Alliance, Molly Meisels, Doniel Weinreich, Amitai Miller, and Anonymous
Other
Jonathan Andrew Berry
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates
801 17th St. NW Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

berry@boydengrayassociates.com
2029550620
Party name: Archdiocese of New York, Biola University, Brigham Young University, Cedarville University, The Church of Latter-day Saints, The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission, Houston Baptist University, Liberty University, The United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, and Wheaton College
Ronald David Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
50 Park Place
Suite 1105
Newark, NJ 07102

rcoleman@dhillonlaw.com
9732981723
Party name: Agudath Israel of America
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: Professor Douglas Laycock
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: National Orthodox Jewish Organizations
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Professor Richard A. Epstein
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Council for Christian Colleges & Universities
Michael C. Wimpfheimer
    Counsel of Record
Wimpfheimer & Wimpfheimer
330 West 58th Street
Suite 209
New York, NY 10019

michael@mwimpfheimer.com
2122478448
Party name: Chief Rabbi of South Africa, Rabbi Dr. Warren Goldstein, the Chief Rabbi of Ukraine, Rabbi Moshe Reuven Azman; Rabbi and Rabbinical Judge of the Upper Beth Din of Israel, Rabbi Eliezer Igra, Chief Rabbi Pinchas Goldschmidt, President of the Conference of European Rabbis, and Rabbinical Council of America
Kara McKenna Rollins
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW, Ste. 450
Washington, DC 20036

kara.rollins@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
(202) 908-6203
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Association of Classical Christian Schools, et al
Michael C. Wimpfheimer
    Counsel of Record
Wimpfheimer & Wimpfheimer
330 West 58th Street
Suite 209
New York, NY 10019

michael@mwimpfheimer.com
2122478448
Party name: Chief Rabbi Ephraim Mirvis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543