Docket for 22-98
 | | No. 22-98 Vide 22-100, 22-97, 22-99 | Title: | Joseph Cacciapalle, Petitioner v. United States, et al. | Docketed: | August 2, 2022 | Linked with 21A711 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (2020-2037) | Decision Date: | February 22, 2022 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
May 09 2022 | Application (21A711) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2022 to July 22, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service | May 12 2022 | Application (21A711) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 22, 2022. | | | Jul 22 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2022) | | PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Aug 05 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2022 to October 3, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 08 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 3, 2022. | | | Sep 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2022 to November 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Sep 30 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 9, 2022. | | | Nov 09 2022 | Brief of respondents United States in opposition filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Nov 29 2022 | Reply of petitioners Joseph Cacciapalle, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 30 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. | | | Jan 09 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|