Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-7044
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-7044
Title:In Re Jordan Powell, Petitioner
Docketed:March 21, 2023
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2023Petition for a writ of mandamus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 20, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixPetitionProof of Service
May 03 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023.
May 22 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jordan Thomas Taylor Powell
    Counsel of Record
1263 1st Street, SE
#523
Washington, DC 20003

jordan@pricecheckpay.com
202-503-5284
Party name: Jordan Powell

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543