SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Accessibility
What Can I See and Do?
Exhibitions
Activities for Students & Families
Maps & Brochures
Student Group Visits
Etiquette
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-591
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-591
Title:
Donald V. Watkins, et al., Petitioners
v.
Matrix, LLC, et al.
Docketed:
December 27, 2022
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(1200892)
Decision Date:
September 23, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 16 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2023)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 25 2023
Waiver of right of respondent Matrix, LLC, et al to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023.
Feb 27 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Byron Renard Perkins
Counsel of Record
Perkins Law, LLC
950 22nd Street North
Suite 825
Birmingham, AL 35203
bperkins@perkins-law.com
2055584696
Party name: Donald Watkins, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Cason M. Kirby
Counsel of Record
Campbell Partners, LLC
505 20th Street North, Suite 1600
Birmingham, AL 35203
cason@campbellpartnerslaw.com
205-224-0752
Party name: Matrix, LLC, et al
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##