Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-451
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-451
Title:Loper Bright Enterprises, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gina Raimondo, Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-5166)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Loper Bright Enterprises, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 09 2022Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 12 2022Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2022 to January 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 14 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2023.
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amici curiae of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Christian Employers Alliance.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Relentless, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by David Goethel, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Motion of Advancing American Freedom for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing.(Duplicate submission) (December 20, 2022)
Dec 15 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Advancing American Freedom, et al.(12/19/2022)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Buckeye Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2023 to February 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2023.
Feb 16 2023Brief of respondents Gina Raimondo, Secretary of Commerce, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023.
Mar 08 2023Reply of petitioners Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023.
Apr 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023.
Apr 24 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023.
May 01 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
May 01 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
May 01 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Christian Employers Alliance GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
May 01 2023Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Relentless, Inc., et al. GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
May 01 2023Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by David Goethel, et al. GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
May 01 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Advancing American Freedom GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
May 01 2023Petition GRANTED limited to Question 2 presented by the petition. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jun 02 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 10, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 30, 2023.
Jun 09 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Loper Bright Enterprises, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 20 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED. Justice Jackson took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Jul 07 2023Motion for a further extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 07 2023Motion to further extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioners' brief on the merits is further extended to and including July 17, 2022. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is further extended to and including September 15, 2023.
Jul 13 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2023Brief amicus curiae of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2023Brief of petitioners Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Lonang Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2023Brief amici curiae of PTAAAARMIGAN LLC, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Manhattan Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of TechFreedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Foundation for Government Accountability filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Thomas W. Merrill in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 24 2023Amicus brief of Competitive Enterprise Institute and Manhattan Institute not accepted for filing. (July 24, 2023--electronically submitted on behalf of incorrect entity.)
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Christian Employers Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of David Goethel and John Haran filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of America First Policy Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of U.S. House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Coalition for a Democratic Workplace, et al. filed supporting neither party.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, Congressman Mike Johnson, and 34 Other Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 26 Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Aditya Bamzai filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Electronic Nicotine Delivery System Industry Stakeholders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of FPC Action Foundation and Firearms Policy Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors Kent Barnett and Christopher J. Walker in support on neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Third Party Payment Processors Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Strive Asset Management filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Advance Colorado Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Governor Brian P. Kemp filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Eight National Business Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Cornerstone Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Ohio Chamber of Commerce filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Free Enterprise Chamber of Commerce filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Sports Shooting Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Buckeye Institute and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Independent Women's Law Center and Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2023Amicus brief of Relentless, Inc., Huntress Inc., SeaFreeze Fleet LLC not accepted for filing. (September 20, 2023)
Sep 15 2023Brief of respondents Raimondo, Gina, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 21 2023Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senators Sheldon Whitehouse, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Environmental Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of American Association for the Advancement of Science, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Administrative Law and the Administrative Procedure Act filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Natural Resources Defense Council filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Administrative and Federal Regulatory Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Conservation Law Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of American Cancer Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Small Business Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 22 2023Brief amici curiae of The District of Columbia, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of The American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations (Oct. 2, 2023) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2023This case is to be argued in tandem with No. 22-1219, Relentless, Inc., et al. v. Dept. of Commerce, et al. in the January 2024 argument session (see order of today in No. 22-1219.)
Oct 16 2023Reply of petitioners Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2023Amicus curiae briefs filed on the merits in this case will also be considered in connection with No. 22-1219, Relentless, Inc., et al. v. Dept. of Commerce, et al.
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, January 17, 2024.
Nov 20 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit.
Nov 22 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit and available with the Clerk. The remainder of the record is available on PACER.
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Jan 17 2024Argued. For petitioners: Paul D. Clement, Alexandria, Va. For respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Loper Bright Enterprises, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Raimondo, Gina, et al.
Other
Aditya Bamzai
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

abamzai@law.virginia.edu
434-243-0698
Party name: Aditya Bamzai
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
TechFreedom
1500 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

CBARTHOLD@TECHFREEDOM.ORG
(771) 200 4997
Party name: TechFreedom
H. Christopher Bartolomucci
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

CBARTOLOMUCCI@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: National Sports Shooting Foundation, Inc.
Harold Craig Becker
    Counsel of Record
815 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

CBECKER@AFLCIO.ORG
202-637-5310
Party name: The American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Jonathan Andrew Berry
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates
801 17th St. NW
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

BERRY@BOYDENGRAYASSOCIATES.COM
2029550620
Party name: Strive Asset Management
Matthew B. Berry
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel
5140 O'Neill House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

matthew.berry@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: U.S. House of Representatives
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
3127017829
Party name: Eight National Business Organizations
Anastasia Paulinna BodenCato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

aboden@cato.org
202-216-1414
Party name: Cato Institute
David Eric Boundy
    Counsel of Record
Potomac Law Group PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Ave NW Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

DBoundy@PotomacLaw.com
646 472 9737
Party name: PTAAAARMIGAN LLC, et al.
Matthew S. Bowman
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

mbowman@adflegal.org
202-393-8690
Party name: Christian Employers Alliance
Kristine Lee Brown
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
8700 E Jefferson Ave #370953
Denver, CO 80237

kristiburtonbrown@gmail.com
720-285-9552
Party name: Advance Colorado Institute
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St. #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Law Building
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: U.S. SENATORS SHELDON WHITEHOUSE, MAZIE HIRONO, DIANE FEINSTEIN, AND ELIZABETH WARREN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS
Matthew John Conigliaro
    Counsel of Record
Carlton Fields, P.A.
4221 W. Boy Scout Blvd., Suite 1000
Tampa, FL 33607

mconigliaro@carltonfields.com
813-229-4254
Party name: America First Policy Institute
Kirti Datla
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
1001 G Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

kdatla@earthjustice.org
2027975241
Party name: Conservation Law Foundation, Ocean Conservancy, and Save the Sound
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue & Goldberg, LLP
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
(202) 277-7085
Party name: Environmental Defense Fund
David Blanton Dove
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor of Georgia
206 Washington Street SW, 201 State Capitol
Atlanta, GA 30334

david.dove@georgia.gov
7062969360
Party name: Governor Brian P. Kemp
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

Jdubner@democracyforward.org
(202) 448-9090
Party name: Small Business Associations
Aditya Dynar
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd.
Ste. 1000
Arlington, VA 22201

ADynar@pacificlegal.org
(202) 807-4472
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Steven Andrew Engel
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

STEVEN.ENGEL@DECHERT.COM
2022613369
Party name: American Free Enterprise Chamber of Commerce
Ian Michael Fein
    Counsel of Record
Natural Resources Defense Council
111 Sutter Street, 21st Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ifein@nrdc.org
(415) 875-6147
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council
Matthew James GinsburgAmerican Fed. of Labor and Congress of Industrial
815 16th St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

MGINSBURG@AFLCIO.ORG
202-637-5397
Party name: The American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Scholars of Administrative Law and the Administrative Procedure Act
Eric Philip Gotting
    Counsel of Record
Keller and Heckman LLP
1001 G Street, NW
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20001

gotting@khlaw.com
2024344296
Party name: Electronic Nicotine Delivery System Industry Stakeholders
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
FPC Action Foundation
5550 Painted Mirage Rd
Suite 320
Las Vegas, NV 89149

jgreenlee@fpclaw.org
(916) 517-1665
Party name: FPC Action Foundation and Firearms Policy Coalition
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: David Goethel and John Haran
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#700
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Dorothy Alicia Hickok
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
One Logan Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103

ALICIA.HICKOK@FAEGREDRINKER.COM
215-988-3364
Party name: THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, AND THE ECOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA
Joseph Dinneen Kearney
    Counsel of Record
Post Office Box 2145
Milwaukee, WI 53201

kearney89@gmail.com
(414) 313-0504
Party name: Professor Thomas W. Merrill
Melinda S. Kollross
    Counsel of Record
Clausen Miller P.C.
10 South LaSalle Street
16th Fl.
Chicago, IL 60603

mkollross@clausen.com
(312) 606-7803
Party name: DRI Center for Law and Public Policy
Scott P. Lewis
    Counsel of Record
Anderson & Kreiger LLP
50 Milk Street
21st Floor
Boston, MA 02109

lewis@andersonkreiger.com
6176216500
Party name: American Cancer Society, et al.
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

ELIN@HUNTONAK.COM
804-788-7202
Party name: Coalition For A Democratic Workplace et al.
Ivan Laurence London
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

ilondon@mslegal.org
(303) 292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
Andrew LyubarskyAFL-CIO
815 Black Lives Matter Plaza, NW
Washington, DC 20006

ALYUBARSKY@AFLCIO.ORG
2026375115
Party name: American Federation of Labor & Congress of Industrial Organizations
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic, Gray Center
3301 Fairfax Dr.
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: U.S. Senator Ted Cruz, Congressman Mike Johnson, and 34 Other Members of Congress
James Patrick McLoughlin Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Moore & Van Allen PLLC
100 North Tryon Street
Suite 4700
Charlotte, NC 28202-4003

jimmcloughlin@mvalaw.com
704-331-1054
Party name: Lawyers’ Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Christopher E. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Spero Law LLC
557 East Bay Street #22251
Charleston, SC 29413

cmills@spero.law
8436060640
Party name: America First Legal Foundation
Kerry Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Pentiuk, Couvreur, & Kubiljak, P.C.
2915 Biddle Avenue
Suite 200
Wyandotte, MI 48192

kmorgan@pck-law.com
734-281-7100
Party name: Lonang Institute
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Mass. Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
2024257499
Party name: Cato Institute
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

SNELSON@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Larry James Obhof Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
41 South High Street
Suite 2400
Columbus, OH 43215

LOBHOF@SHUMAKER.COM
(614) 463-9441
Party name: Ohio Chamber of Commerce
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.
Michael James O'Neill
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Ave. Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

MIKE@LANDMARKLEGAL.ORG
703-554-6105
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
P.O. Box 3073
Gainesville, GA 30503

jackparklaw@gmail.com
678-608-1920
Party name: The Buckeye Institute and National Federation of Independent Business
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ERASSBACH@BECKETLAW.ORG
2029550095
Party name: The Little Sisters of the Poor Saints Peter and Paul Home
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
333 Washington Street
suite 850
Boston, MA 02108

brobbins@newenglandlegal.org
6176953660
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center; Washington Legal Foundation
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 17 Other States
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

LINDSAY.S.SEE@WVAGO.GOV
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 26 Other States
Loren Ariela Seehase
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

lseehase@ljc.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Manhattan Institute
52 Vanderbilt Ave.
New York, NY 10017

ishapiro@manhattan-institute.org
212-599-7000
Party name: Manhattan Institute
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Administrative and Federal Regulatory Law Professors
Kathryn Elizabeth Tarbert
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ktarbert@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Kathryn Elizabeth TarbertSchaerr Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ktarbert@schaerr-jaffe.com
2027871060
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Independent Women's Law Center
J. Gregory TroutmanTroutman Law Office, PLLC.
4205 Springhurst Boulevard
Suite 201
Louisville, KY 40241

JGTATTY@YAHOO.COM
502-412-9179
Party name: Electronic Nicotine Delivery System Industry Stakeholders
David Christian Tryon
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215

d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
(614) 224-4422
Party name: Buckeye Institute and National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc.
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 West Monroe
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

MISHA.TSEYTLIN@TROUTMAN.COM
608-999-1240
Party name: Third Party Payment Processors Association
Caroline Sage Van Zile
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for D.C.
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: The District of Columbia et al.
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036-2411

john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2029186902
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036-2411

john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695210
Party name: Relentless, Inc., Huntress Inc., SeaFreeze Fleet LLC
Christopher Jay Walker
    Counsel of Record
University of Michigan Law School
701 South State Street
Ann Arbor, MI 48109-3091

christopher.j.walker@gmail.com
(734) 763-3812
Party name: Professors Kent Barnett and Christopher J. Walker
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Charles Devin Watkins
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L Street NW, 7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

devin.watkins@cei.org
503-753-8104
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute
Charles Devin Watkins
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L Street NW, 7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

devin.watkins@cei.org
202-331-1010
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute and Manhattan Institute
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
2027378808
Party name: American Cornerstone Institute
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

mwheat@advancingamericanfreedom.com
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom
Stewart Lee Whitson
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Government Accountability
15275 Collier Blvd, Ste. 201
Naples, FL 34119

stewart@thefga.org
239-244-8808
Party name: The Foundation for Government Accountability
William James Young
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Def. Fdtn., Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wjy@nrtw.org
(703) 321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543