Docket for 22-360
 | | No. 22-360
| Title: | Veteran Warriors, Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs | Docketed: | October 18, 2022 | Linked with 22A202 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (2021-1378) | Decision Date: | March 25, 2022 | Rehearing Denied: | June 17, 2022 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Aug 31 2022 | Application (22A202) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 15, 2022 to October 14, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Sep 06 2022 | Application (22A202) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 14, 2022. | | | Oct 14 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 17, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 25 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Oct 26 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2022. | | | Nov 17 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of The Federal Circuit Bar Association filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 17 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 29 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 19, 2022 to January 18, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 01 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 18, 2023. | | | Jan 18 2023 | Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veteran Affairs in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Jan 31 2023 | Reply of petitioner Veteran Warriors, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. | | | Feb 21 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|