SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-234
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-234
Title:
Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cook County, Illinois, et al.
Docketed:
September 13, 2022
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-2561)
Decision Date:
June 27, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2022)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 23 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2022 to November 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 26 2022
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2022, for all respondents.
Nov 09 2022
Brief of respondents Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. and Cook County, Illinois in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2022
Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 28 2022
Reply of petitioners Texas, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Judd Edward Stone II
Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548
judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Tacy Fletcher Flint
Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1 S. Dearborn St.
Chicago, IL 60603
tflint@sidley.com
312-853-7875
Party name: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.; Cook County, Illinois
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##