Docket for 21M31
 | | No. 21M31
| Title: | Dakota Access, LLC, Petitioner v. Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, et al. | Docketed: | September 22, 2021 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit | Case Numbers: | (20-5197, 20-5201) | Decision Date: | | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Sep 20 2021 | Motion (21M31) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed. | | | Sep 29 2021 | MOTION (21M31) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021. | | | Oct 18 2021 | Motion (21M31) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. Justice Alito and Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion. | | |
|