Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21A198
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21A198
Title:Lucas Wall, et al., Applicants
v.
Transportation Security Administration
Docketed:December 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1220)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 29 2021Application (21A198) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Dec 09 2021Application (21A198) denied by The Chief Justice.
Dec 21 2021Application (21A198) refiled and submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Dec 29 2021Application (21A198) referred to the Court.
Jan 18 2022Application (21A198) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lucas Wall435 10th Street, NE
Washington, DC 20002

Party name: Wall, Lucas, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543