SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-990
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-990
Title:
Aldrich L. Boss, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stewart R. Crane, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:
January 12, 2022
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-2061)
Decision Date:
October 6, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2022)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 25 2022
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 16 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 07 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ernest Edward Badway
Counsel of Record
Fox Rothschild LLP
100 Park Avenue, Suite 1500
New York, NY 10017
ebadway@foxrothschild.com
12128787986
Party name: Aldrich Boss
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##