SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Accessibility
What Can I See and Do?
Exhibitions
Activities for Students & Families
Maps & Brochures
Student Group Visits
Etiquette
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-859
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-859
Title:
The Montana State Legislature, et al., Petitioners
v.
Beth McLaughlin
Docketed:
December 9, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Montana
Case Numbers:
(OP 21-0173)
Decision Date:
July 14, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
September 7, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2022)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 16 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2022 to February 9, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 17 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 9, 2022.
Jan 10 2022
Brief amicus curiae of Governor Greg Gianforte filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 09 2022
Brief of respondent Beth McLaughlin in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 23 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 02 2022
Reply of petitioners Montana State Legislature, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Morgan Steven DeWhirst
Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 201401
215 North Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401
David.Dewhirst@mt.gov
4064442026
Party name: The Montana State Legislature, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Randy J. Cox
Counsel of Record
Boone Karlberg P.C.
201 West Main, Suite 300
Missoula, MT 59802
rcox@boonekarlberg.com
406-543-6646
Party name: Beth McLaughlin
Other
Anita Yvonne Milanovich
Counsel of Record
Office of the Governor
1301 E 6th Ave.
Helena, MT 59601
anita.milanovich@mt.gov
4064445554
Party name: Governor Greg Gianforte
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##