SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-7769
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-7769
Vide 21-7892
Title:
Lonnell Tucker, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
May 4, 2022
Linked with 21A547
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-3042)
Decision Date:
September 3, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
January 13, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 23 2022
Application (21A547) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 13, 2022 to May 13, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 25 2022
Application (21A547) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 13, 2022.
May 02 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 3, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
May 11 2022
Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
May 25 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 03 2022
Brief amici curiae of Criminal Law Scholars and Legal Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jun 13 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen C. Leckar
Counsel of Record
Kalbain Hagerty LLP
888-17th Street., NW
Suite 1200
Washington, DC 20006
sleckar@kalbianhagerty.com
202-419-3286
Party name: Lonnell Tucker
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Dawinder Singh Sidhu
Counsel of Record
Hopwood & Singhal, PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006
sidhu@hopwoodsinghal.com
202-769-4080
Party name: Criminal Law Scholars and Legal Organizations
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##