Docket for 21-1322
|
Jan 19 2022 | Application (21A349) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2022 to March 17, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 22 2022 | Application (21A349) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 17, 2022. | | | Mar 05 2022 | Application (21A349) to extend further the time from March 17, 2022 to March 31, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Mar 10 2022 | Application (21A349) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 31, 2022. | | | Mar 31 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 05 2022 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Hon. Melanie Cyganowski, et al. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 03 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Chapter 13 Trustees. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 04 2022 | Brief of respondent PHH Mortgage Corporation in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 24 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022. | | | May 25 2022 | Reply of petitioner Jan M. Sensenich, Chapter 13 Trustee filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 13 2022 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Hon. Melanie Cyganowski, et al. GRANTED. | | | Jun 13 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Association of Chapter 13 Trustees GRANTED. | | | Jun 13 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|