SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-1257
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-1257
Title:
Brian K. Evans, as Administrator of the Estate of Helen Marie Bousquet, Petitioner
v.
Ronald A. Marvin, et al.
Docketed:
March 16, 2022
Lower Ct:
Appeals Court of Massachusetts
Case Numbers:
(2019-P-0288)
Decision Date:
November 22, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
January 14, 2022
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2022)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 15 2022
Brief of Anne Marie Mede, R.N., et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (April 26, 2022) (corrected efiling to be submitted)
Apr 15 2022
Brief of respondents Anne Marie Mede, R.N., et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2022
Reply of petitioner Brian K. Evans filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
May 03 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022
Petition DENIED.
Jun 07 2022
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Other
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 07 2022
DISTRIBUTED.
Jul 15 2022
Supplemental brief to petition for rehearing filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Aug 01 2022
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian K. Evans
37 Diamond Run Street
Las Vegas, NV 89148
belasvegas@yahoo.com
(808) 276-5235
Party name: Brian K. Evans
Attorneys for Respondents
Chad Paul Brouillard
Counsel of Record
Foster & Eldridge, LLP
300 Trade Center, Suite2610
Woburn, MA 01801
cbrouillard@fosteld.com
6172523366
Party name: Anne Marie Mede, R.N., Holy Family Hospital, Steward Medical Group, Inc. and Steward HealthCare System, LLC, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##