Docket for 21-1248
 | | No. 21-1248
| Title: | Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Petitioner v. Washington, et al. | Docketed: | March 15, 2022 | Linked with 21A331 | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (20-35346, 20-35353) | Decision Date: | August 6, 2021 | Rehearing Denied: | November 12, 2021 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Jan 12 2022 | Application (21A331) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2022 to March 12, 2022, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Jan 18 2022 | Application (21A331) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 12, 2022. | | | Mar 11 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2022) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 18 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Samish Indian Nation to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 29 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent State of Washington, Governor Jay Inslee, Washington State Department of Fish and Wildlife, Wildlife Director Kelly Susewind to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 31 2022 | Motion of Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (April 08, 2022--Document not of the type that is e-filed) | | | Apr 05 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 06 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022. | | | Apr 06 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Cougar Den, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 07 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 25 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|