Docket for 21-1213
 | | No. 21-1213
| Title: | Michael Broaden, Petitioner v. Department of Transportation | Docketed: | March 7, 2022 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (2021-2000) | Decision Date: | November 17, 2021 | Rehearing Denied: | | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Feb 01 2022 | Motion f(21M89) or leave to proceed as a veteran filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Feb 01 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 16 2022 | MOTION (21M89) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022. | | | Mar 07 2022 | Motion (21M89) for leave to proceed as a veteran Granted. | | | Mar 24 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Department of Transportation to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022. | | | Apr 18 2022 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|