SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-941
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-941
Title:
Gregory Atkins, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kenneth Williams, Medical Director, Tennessee Department of Correction
Docketed:
January 13, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-6243)
Decision Date:
August 24, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 25 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2021 to March 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2021.
Mar 12 2021
Brief of respondent Kenneth Williams in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 31 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Mar 31 2021
Reply of petitioners Gregory Atkins, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 19 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Joseph Wall
Counsel of Record
Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC
223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203
michaelw@bsjfirm.com
615-254-8801
Party name: Gregory Atkins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Keeton Campbell
Counsel of Record
Tennessee Office of the Attorney General
500 Dr. Martin L. King, Jr., Blvd.
Nashville, TN 37243
Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: Kenneth Williams
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##