Docket for 20-656
 | | No. 20-656
| Title: | Robert Kinghorn, et al., Petitioners v. United States | Docketed: | November 13, 2020 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (2019-2101) | Decision Date: | May 18, 2020 | Rehearing Denied: | August 5, 2020 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Nov 03 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 07 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. | | | Jan 11 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | | Feb 05 2021 | Petition of Steven Schooley for rehearing not accepted for filing. (Paper filing not received - April 9, 2021) | | | Apr 22 2021 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioners. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | May 11 2021 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021. | | | Jun 01 2021 | Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioners DENIED. | | |
|