SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-335
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-335
Title:
Maryland Reclamation Associates, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Harford County, Maryland
Docketed:
September 14, 2020
Lower Ct:
Court of Appeals of Maryland
Case Numbers:
(52, September Term, 2019)
Decision Date:
April 24, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
May 11, 2020
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2020
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2020)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 15 2020
Waiver of right of respondent Harford County, Maryland to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 16 2020
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Oct 13 2020
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Ralph Greiber Jr.
Counsel of Record
Smouse and Mason LLC
225 Duke of Gloucester St.
Annapolis, MD 21401
jrg@smouseandmason.com
410-991-1233
Party name: Maryland Reclamation Associates Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew H. Baida
Counsel of Record
Rosenberg Martin Greenberg, LLP
25 S. Charles Street
21st Floor
Baltimore, MD 21201-0000
abaida@rosenbergmartin.com
4107276120
Party name: Harford County, Maryland
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##