Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1738
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1738
Title:Janet L. Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States House of Representatives
Docketed:June 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5176)
   Decision Date:September 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:January 13, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 11 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 15, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Jul 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 15, 2021 to August 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 16, 2021.
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2021 to August 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 30, 2021.
Aug 30 2021Brief of respondent United States House of Representatives in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Sep 15 2021Reply of petitioners Janet L.Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED with instructions to dismiss the case as moot. See United States v. Munsingwear, Inc., 340 U. S. 36 (1950).
Nov 15 2021JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Janet L.Yellen, Secretary of the Treasury, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives
5140 O'Neill House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: United States House of Representatives

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543