SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1693
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1693
Title:
Erick Allen Osby, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
June 7, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-4789)
Decision Date:
December 31, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 7, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 30 2021
Brief amici curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Dream Corps Justice, and R Street Institute filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 01 2021
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 07 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 07 2021
Brief amici curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 07 2021
Brief amici curiae of Former Federal District Court Judges and Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 07 2021
Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 24 2021
Supplemental brief of petitioner Erick Allen Osby filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Caroline Swift Platt
Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
1650 King Street, Suite 500
Alexandria, VA 22314
caroline_platt@fd.org
703-600-0810
Party name: Erick Allen Osby
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Christopher D. Man
Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1901 L Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036
cman@winston.com
202-282-5622
Party name: Former Federal District Court Judges and Law Professors
Michael David Pepson
Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201
mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation, National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Dream Corps Justice, and R Street Institute
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller
Counsel of Record
O' Melveny & Myers
400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071
jschneller@omm.com
213-430-8115
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM
Jay Remington Schweikert
Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001
jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##