SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Accessibility
What Can I See and Do?
Exhibitions
Activities for Students & Families
Maps & Brochures
Student Group Visits
Etiquette
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1503
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1503
Title:
Robert C. Laity, Petitioner
v.
Kamala D. Harris
Docketed:
April 28, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-7109)
Decision Date:
February 5, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
March 18, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2021)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Appendix
Proof of Service
May 07 2021
Waiver of right of respondent Harris, Kamala to respond filed.
Main Document
May 11 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 28 2021
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021
Petition DENIED.
Jun 16 2021
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 08 2021
DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 02 2021
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert C. Laity
43 Mosher Drive
Tonawanda, NY 14150-5217
(716) 260-1392
Party name: Robert Laity
Attorneys for Respondent
Beth Susan Brinkmann
Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956
bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Harris, Kamala
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##