Docket for 20-1462
|
Apr 15 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2021) | | PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021. | | | Jun 10 2021 | Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2021) | | | Jul 06 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 12, 2021 to August 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 07 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 11, 2021. | | | Aug 11 2021 | Brief of respondents Gulf LNG Energy, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 25 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. | | | Oct 04 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|