Docket for 20-1432
 | | No. 20-1432 Vide 20-1162 | Title: | United States, Petitioner v. Maine Community Health Options, et al. | Docketed: | April 13, 2021 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit | Case Numbers: | (2019-2102, 2019-1633) | Decision Date: | August 14, 2020 | Rehearing Denied: | November 10, 2020 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Apr 09 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2021) | | PetitionProof of Service | May 06 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2021 to May 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 07 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2021. | | | May 17 2021 | Brief of respondents Maine Community Health Options, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jun 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021. | | | Jun 01 2021 | Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jun 21 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|