SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 20-1362
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 20-1362
Title:
Davdrin Goffin, Petitioner
v.
Robbie K. Ashcraft, et al.
Docketed:
March 30, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-1430)
Decision Date:
October 15, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 29, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 06 2021
Waiver of right of respondent Robbie Ashcraft to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021
Brief amici curiae of DC Justice Lab, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 11 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 12 2021
Response Requested. (Due June 11, 2021)
May 28 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021.
Jul 12 2021
Brief of respondent Robbie Ashcraft in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 28 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 25 2021
Reply of petitioner Davdrin Goffin filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Scott Harawa
Counsel of Record
Washington University in St. Louis School of Law
One Brookings Drive
Box 1120
St. Louis, MO 63130
dharawa@wustl.edu
3149354689
Party name: Davdrin Goffin
Attorneys for Respondents
Timothy Towery Coates
Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036
tcoates@gmsr.com
(310) 859-7811
Party name: Robbie Ashcraft
Jenna Allison Adams
Arkansas Municipal League
P.O. Box 38
North Little Rock, AR 72115
jenadams@arml.org
5019786115
Party name: Robbie Ashcraft
Other
Mae Catherine Quinn
Counsel of Record
Youth Justice Clinic
University of District of Columbia - David A. Clarke School of Law
4340 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20008
mae.quinn@udc.edu
202-274-5073
Party name: DC Justice Lab, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##