Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1158
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1158
Title:The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Will McRaney
Docketed:February 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-60293)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 25, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Mar 02 2021Waiver of Will McRaney of right to respond not accepted for filing. (March 04, 2021)
Mar 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent Will McRaney to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 12 2021Brief amici curiae of The American Association of Christian Schools & The Association of Christian Schools International filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 22 2021Response Requested. (Due April 21, 2021)
Mar 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 21, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2021.
Mar 25 2021Brief amici curiae of National Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Agudath Israel of America and Torah Umesorah filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 21 2021Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee, and Utah filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Elizabeth A. Clark, Robert F. Cochran, Jr., Carl H. Esbeck, David F. Forte, Richard W. Garnett, Christopher C. Lund, Michael W. McConnell, Michael P. Moreland, Robert J. Pushaw, and David A. Skeel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2021Brief of respondent Will McRaney in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
May 28 2021Reply of petitioner The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 16 2021Rescheduled.
Jun 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jun 28 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Theodore Martens
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

matthew.martens@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: The North American Mission Board of the Southern Baptist Convention, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott E. Gant
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
202-237-2727
Party name: Will McRaney
William Harvey Barton IIBarton Law Firm, PLLC
3007 Magnolia Street
Pascagoula, MS 39567

harvey@wbartonlaw.com
228-769-2070
Party name: Will McRaney
Other
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: National Legal Foundation, et al.
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Professors Elizabeth A. Clark, Robert F. Cochran, Jr., Carl H. Esbeck, David F. Forte, Richard W. Garnett, Christopher C. Lund, Michael W. McConnell, Michael P. Moreland, Robert J. Pushaw, and David A. Skeel
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, Tennessee, and Utah
Igor Victor Timofeyev
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
2050 M Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

igortimofeyev@paulhastings.com
202-551-1792
Party name: Agudath Israel of America and Torah Umesorah
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State Street, Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention
Zachary Guy Parks
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

zparks@cov.com
2022850524
Party name: The American Association of Christian Schools & The Association of Christian Schools International

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543