Docket for 20-1093
 | | No. 20-1093
| Title: | Just Energy Marketing Corp., et al., Petitioners v. Davina Hurt, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, et al. | Docketed: | February 11, 2021 | | | Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit | Case Numbers: | (18-4058) | Decision Date: | August 31, 2020 | Rehearing Denied: | September 30, 2020 | Discretionary Court Decision Date: | | | | |
|
Feb 02 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2021) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 23 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2021 to April 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 24 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2021. | | | Mar 15 2021 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, and the Direct Selling Association filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 27 2021 | Letter of March 27, 2021 from counsel for petitioners filed. | | Main Document | Mar 30 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 14, 2021 to April 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 31 2021 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 28, 2021. | | | Apr 28 2021 | Brief of respondents Davina Hurt, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 17 2021 | Reply of petitioners Just Energy Marketing Corp., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 18 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021. | | | Jun 07 2021 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|